CANTERBURY HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a safe, accessible inclusive fitness and wellbeing facility for the public benefit in Canterbury which will support the provision of sports and activities that encourage health and fitness whilst promoting inclusion and integration amongst all age, ethnic and ability groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY JAMES PHELAN | Chair | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALICE MARY HILLMAN | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN RONALD MORRISON | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.42k | £19.06k | £18.39k | £9.10k | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £13.15k | £13.64k | £16.91k | £15.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.50k | £18.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING IN CANTERBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE SUPPORT, ENCOURAGEMENT AND DELIVERY OF FITNESS ACTIVITIES, SPORTS AND SERVICES RELEVANT AND AVAILABLE TO MEET THESE NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Woodside road
Sturry
CANTERBURY
CT2 0NY
- Phone:
- 07967612185
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window