SHEFFIELD BACH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public in the arts and sciences, particularly the art and science of music, by maintaining a choir and performing up to six concerts per year plus occasional smaller concerts and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
63 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 March 1981: Standard registration
- SHEFFIELD BACH CHOIR - BACH CHOIR (Working name)
- THE SHEFFIELD BACH SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Walker | Chair | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Hogan | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Petra Michelle Nortcliffe | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
StJohn Paul Wright | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Elisabeth Paice | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
NEIL PATRICK DUMMIGAN | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ALAN HEATH | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Catherine Ross | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANNE ADAMS | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.59k | £7.29k | £27.11k | £23.63k | £32.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.44k | £7.71k | £29.36k | £27.05k | £39.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1981 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AND PERFORMANCE OF THE WORKS OF J. S BACH AND SUCH OTHER COMPOSERS AS ARE DEEMED APPROPRIATE, BY PROMOTING CONCERTS AND RECITALS DEVOTED TO THEIR MUSIC AND BY MAINTAINING A CHOIR FOR THIS PURPOSE; AND BY SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE SOCIETY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Bentley Road
Sheffield
S6 5DZ
- Phone:
- 01142665919
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window