K.U.K ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
K.U.K Alliance actively searches for avenues to make a difference, igniting challenging conversations with peers so we can empower and give back to the youth of Zimbabwe. We specifically help orphaned and disadvantaged children in Zimbabwe obtain access to education, mentorship as well as address any issues that may act as a barrier to their successful future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 06 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NTOKOZO NYASHA GAZI | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUFARO CHIRISERI | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MISS S SHANU | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.19k | £11.34k | £14.45k | £11.85k | £17.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.92k | £8.75k | £8.73k | £12.00k | £17.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
K.U.K ALLIANCE IS ESTABLISHED TO FURTHER THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AFRICA, ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES WITH A SPECIAL FOCUS ON ZIMBABWE:- 1)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; 2)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH; 3)TO RELIEVE POVERTY; 4)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND / OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED; AND 5)TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AFRICA, WITH A SPECIAL FOCUS ON ZIMBABWE
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 Tanner Street
London
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 07715995264
- Email:
- info@kukalliance.org
- Website:
-
kukalliance.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window