Financial history FAITH AGLOW MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1175792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.78k £40.89k £37.35k £43.92k £59.78k
Total expenditure £17.96k £4.72k £4.82k £17.02k £19.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A