ECOBIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We exist to affect that social change and the transition towards a low-carbon and sustainable lifestyle. By inspiring and supporting communities and organisations across Birmingham to take positive action, we will demonstrate that building low carbon communities brings benefits, opportunities and well-being to everyone, whilst protecting our environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,635 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 29 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rickie Josen | Chair | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emille Taswar | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ridwan Adam | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Whiteman | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Holloway Neville | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arshdeep Kaur | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Jane Hopkin | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.36k | £267.09k | £187.51k | £221.15k | £251.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.45k | £228.47k | £210.96k | £250.03k | £263.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £43.28k | £97 | N/A | £6.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECT(S) OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; 3.1.3 TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 3, "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS".
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAC Birmingham
Cannon Hill Park
BIRMINGHAM
B12 9QH
- Phone:
- 0121 794 3015
- Email:
- info@ecobirmingham.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window