Financial history STREET PAWS

Charity Number: 1178826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £150.14k £152.47k £100.24k £90.90k £93.68k
Total expenditure £84.58k £71.02k £98.65k £90.38k £102.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A