HOT RYBEANA MENTORING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOT RyBEANA has recently created a personal development programme (PDP). Areas we focus on include Business & Enterprise, Careers, Communication, English (L2), Financial Fundamentals, Food Tech, and Maths (L2). All sessions are currently delivered online and were designed to help young people who have been excluded from education, care levers and those with special educational needs, (SEN).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 06 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Bernadette Hoyte | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gardner | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DONNA REBECCA MITCHAM | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA LOUISE SHERWIN | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA MONIQUEE' HOYTE-MORRIS | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MERISSA CHARLENE HOYTE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARY JACKSON | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NOBUHLE THEBE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANA SUSANNA MAY | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 May 2024 | 465 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2025 | 731 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 May 2024 | 830 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2025 | 1096 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 May 2024 | 1195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1576 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE KINGSMEAD SCHOOL AND OTHERS SCHOOLS WITHIN DERBY CITY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Stockwell Drive
Mackworth
DERBY
DE22 4NW
- Phone:
- 07931719794
- Email:
- tremain95@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window