Financial history THE CENTRE@CANTLEY LTD.

Charity number: 1177851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.57k £20 £4.26k £17.60k £13.74k
Total expenditure £3.50k £1.25k £3.88k £4.49k £15.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.37k