Trustees THE COUNSELLING HUB
Charity Number: 1178563

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Pearce Salisbury | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norman Bellis | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Adam Morton | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIKI MARIE SALE | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULA RINGEVAL | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Adam Phillips | Trustee | 30 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.