SLEAFORD SMALL-BORE RIFLE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 24 March 1981: Standard registration
- 06 April 1994: Removed (Ceased to be charitable)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1951 AMENDED 26 AUGUST 1980 AND 12 JANUARY 1981.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE INSTRUCTION AND PRACTICE IN THE USE OF THE SMALL-BORE RIFLE TO ANY OF HER MAJESTY'S SUBJECTS SO THAT THEY WILL BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN THE ARMED FORCES TERRITORIAL ARMY OR ANY OTHER ORGANISATION IN WHICH THEIR SERVICES MAY BE REQUIRED IN THE DEFENCE OF THE REALM IN TIMES OF PERIL.
Area of benefit
SLEAFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.