Financial history TAUNTON MODEL ENGINEERS

Charity number: 1178760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £86.59k £26.48k £32.88k £34.00k £42.14k
Total expenditure £10.18k £102.17k £12.94k £18.00k £18.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A