TAUNTON MODEL ENGINEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of public education in engineering, with a particular focus on model engineering to include, without limitation, engineering in relation to traction, stationary, hot air and internal combustion engines, locomotives, boats, tools, clock making, robots and vehicle restoration through the construction and operation of models of engineering, the provision of talks, workshops, publi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 13 June 2018: Standard registration
- TME (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JULIAN HARTLAND | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary LeCoyte | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHIL MORTIMER | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD LESLIE HART | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIM GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVE WOOD | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.59k | £26.48k | £32.88k | £34.00k | £42.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.18k | £102.17k | £12.94k | £18.00k | £18.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 APR 1995 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENGINEERING, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON MODEL ENGINEERING TO INCLUDE, WITHOUT LIMITATION, ENGINEERING IN RELATION TO TRACTION, STATIONARY, HOT AIR AND INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES, LOCOMOTIVES, BOATS, TOOLS, CLOCK MAKING, ROBOTS AND VEHICLE RESTORATION THROUGH THE CONSTRUCTION AND OPERATION OF MODELS OF ENGINEERING, THE PROVISION OF TALKS, WORKSHOPS, PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS AND DEMONSTRATIONS AND BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR CONSTRUCTION, DEVELOPMENT AND THE RUNNING OF ENGINEERING MODELS; AND 2) TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Webb Engineering
METEOR HOUSE
Culmhead Business Centre
Culmhead
TAUNTON
TA3 7DY
- Phone:
- 01823 277255
- Email:
- secretary@tauntonme.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window