THE SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School Governance Body. Assisting schools implement high academic and administrative standards. Development of School Management Systems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Lithuania
- Malaysia
- Portugal
- Russia
Governance
- 01 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL ALAN ELMS | Chair | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ordovas | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anderton | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ORDOVAS | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.50k | £0 | £0 | £18.50k | £15.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.81k | £17.70k | £14.18k | £8.27k | £10.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 96 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED IS THE PROMOTION OR REGULATION OF EDUCATION AND ANYTHING INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO ANY OF THAT OBJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 1
The Residence
26 Trinity Place
WINDSOR
SL4 3AP
- Phone:
- 07774753830
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window