LIPODYSTROPHY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lipodystrophy UK is a dedicated UK patient group set up to support people with Lipodystrophy. Our mission is to raise awareness of Lipodystrophy, support those who may be affected by Lipodystrophy and advocate for excellent clinical care and scientific research into these conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 October 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rebecca Sanders | Chair | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Smith | Trustee | 02 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Patricia Dunn | Trustee | 02 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/10/2018 | 26/10/2019 | 26/10/2020 | 26/10/2021 | 26/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.70k | £4.16k | £2.40k | £941 | £918 | |
|
Total expenditure | £803 | £1.41k | £1.19k | £276 | £1.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days | |
Annual return | 26 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 October 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 October 2020 | 30 January 2022 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2020 | 30 January 2022 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
I. TO RAISE AWARENESS OF LIPODYSTROPHY CONDITIONS, BOTH WITHIN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC; II. TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE WITH LIPODYSTROPHY AND THOSE AFFECTED BY IT; III. TO ADVOCATE FOR EXCELLENT CARE AND IMPROVED TREATMENT OPTIONS FOR PEOPLE WITH LIPODYSTROPHY; IV. TO ENCOURAGE RESEARCH ADDRESSING THE CONCERNS OF PEOPLE WITH LIPODYSTROPHY
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Collington Way
Kingston Bagpuize
ABINGDON
OX13 5GP
- Phone:
- 07754521071
- Email:
- lipodystrophyuk@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window