A World With Friends

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is unchanged - please leave as it is
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 November 2017: CIO registration
- A World With Friends (Previous name)
- FRIEND FINDER OFFICIAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BARHAM | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||
DONNA MARIE JONES | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZOE MAY | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.71k | £15.55k | £23.77k | £20.81k | £10.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.13k | £18.69k | £11.83k | £31.25k | £10.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2024 | 344 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2024 | 344 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2023 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2023 | 198 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2022 | 348 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2022 | 348 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2022 | 512 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2022 | 512 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Nov 2017 as amended on 05 May 2019 as amended on 05 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT(S) OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION), CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY ILLNESS OR DISABILITY, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: (A) PROVIDING LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND OPPORTUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH OTHER YOUNG PEOPLE IN SIMILAR CIRCUMSTANCES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; AND (B) PROMOTING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND DIVERSITY AND PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR A PART OF A SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS CHILDREN OR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 TO 30 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; FAMILY BREAKDOWN; DISABILITY OR WHO ARE WITHIN, OR HAVE EXPERIENCED THE PUBLIC CARE SYSTEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Prospect Lane
HAVANT
Hampshire
PO9 5SS
- Phone:
- 079413324670
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window