Financial history HUTTON FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1175495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £132.02k £145.91k £124.00k £116.06k £248.09k
Total expenditure £110.72k £125.12k £127.24k £130.99k £255.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.19k N/A N/A N/A