Accounts and annual returns THE REVIVALIST MINISTRIES WORLD OUTREACH

Charity number: 1176027
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 October 2022 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 June 2021 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required