THE STEPHEN BURTON MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objectives are to apply the income and all of such part or parts of the capital to or towards the provision of financial assistance for boys attending Dulwich College London SE21, and in particular such boys of good strong character showing leadership qualities and outstanding aptitude or potential for rugby, hockey or cricket and reasonable academic ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simrun Garcha | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
Kathryn Alice Beasley | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROBERT ANTHONY KENDALL | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.19k | £12.97k | £15.30k | £21.10k | £16.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.87k | £38.23k | £38.58k | £37.83k | £38.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 06 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST AT THEIR SOLE AND ABSOLUTE DISCRETION TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR OR TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR BOYS ATTENDING DULWICH COLLEGE LONDON SE21 AND IN PARTICULAR SUCH BOYS OF GOOD STRONG CHARACTER SHOWING LEADERSHIP QUALITIES AND OUTSTANDING APTITUDE OR POTENTIAL FOR RUGBY HOCKEY OR CRICKET AND REASONABLE ACADEMIC ABILITY SUCH ASSISTANCE NOT TO EXCEED ONE HALF OF THE FEES PAYABLE IN RESPECT OF SUCH BOY AND TO INCLUDE IF POSSIBLE ASSISTANCE FOR AT LEAST ONE 11 OR 13 YEAR OLD ENTRY PUPIL PER YEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
PINNERS HALL
105-108 OLD BROAD STREET
LONDON
EC2N 1ER
- Phone:
- 02078428000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window