FLYNNE'S BARN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Flynne's Barn is a place where young people living with cancer can come together and make connections in the beautiful surroundings of the Lake District. During their stay visitors can find friendship and support from others who are going through similar experiences. A range of creative and outdoor activities are offered to promote enjoyment and wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lizzie Overton | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Mills | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Chapman | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Owen | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karthica Indramohan | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Walter | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MCKERROW | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.26k | £14.72k | £59.35k | £46.50k | £63.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.76k | £10.35k | £14.18k | £42.31k | £69.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.87k | £9.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 DIAGNOSED AND LIVING WITH CANCER AND OTHER LIFE-CHANGING ILLNESSES BY PROVIDING HOLIDAYS AND CREATIVE WORKSHOPS, OUTWARD BOUND ACTIVITIES, EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thorneythwaite Farm
Borrowdale
KESWICK
CA12 5XQ
- Phone:
- 01768800686
- Email:
- info@flynnesbarn.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window