Trustees PLYMPTON U3A

Charity number: 1176442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
lesley peat Chair 26 July 2022
None on record
Valerie Anne Moody Trustee 11 October 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Hyatt Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Janet Hexter Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Rhiannon Prys-Owen Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
brian field Trustee 26 July 2022
None on record
ROSEMARY KAY MITCHELMORE Trustee 19 July 2019
None on record
SYLVIA CONSTANCE GUTHRIG Trustee 08 July 2016
None on record