Financial history BURCOTT AND DISTRICT RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1176600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.06k £1.90k £2.07k £1.61k £2.72k
Total expenditure £6.44k £782 £3.09k £5.32k £4.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A