C A S S CUMBRIA ACTION FOR SOCIAL SUPPORT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supported Housing for ex-offenders or those at risk of offending
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 16 April 1981: Standard registration
- 28 March 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 March 2019: Funds transferred to 515755 Waythrough
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £643.04k | £669.71k | £650.24k | £627.03k | £69.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £694.40k | £697.58k | £656.60k | £742.95k | £161.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £264.94k | £267.62k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £639.70k | £666.45k | £647.09k | £623.91k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.34k | £3.26k | £3.15k | £3.12k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £687.95k | £692.19k | £651.80k | £742.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.45k | £5.39k | £4.80k | £4.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 24 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 24 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 20 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 01 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 February 2016 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 16 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 FEBRUARY 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 MAY 1988 AND 25 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS WITH WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO RELIEVE SOCIAL DEPRIVATION AMONG PERSONS AND FAMILIES REFERRED TO THE NATIONAL PROBATION SERVICE (CUMBRIA) OR DIRECTLY TO C.A.S.S (CUMBRIA ACTION FOR SOCIAL SUPPORT) LIMITED AND TO FURTHER RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION FOR SUCH PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window