Financial history THE LARKFIELD WOMEN'S CLUB

Charity number: 1175625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.68k £4.30k £633 £3.47k £9.48k
Total expenditure £7.70k £4.19k £620 £3.74k £7.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A