Trustees CENTRAL JAMIA MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC EDUCATIONAL CENTRE
Charity number: 1176965

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KALEEM UR REHMAN | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chaudhry Adrees Ahmed | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Mushtaq | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Qasim Awan | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Umair Sarwar | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mumtaz Ahmed Hashmi | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Israr Hussain | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ZULFIQAR ALI | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
GHULAM JILLANI | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.