INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We channel our resources into the health sector: the provision of primary and secondary health care services in emergencies; the rehabilitation of health infrastructure (both buildings and equipment); the training of health workers (both hospital and community based); public health interventions; and the improvement of rehabilitation services for those with disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Lebanon
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 11 February 2019: CIO registration
- I.D.E.A.L.S (Working name)
- IDEALS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Ferguson | Chair | 11 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Basil Budair MBBS FRCS | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Timothy Edward Elliott Goodacre | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
ALAN FREDERICK GRAEME GROOM | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Oliver James McTernan | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Louise Phillips | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Nigel James Silman | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Eamon Paul McCoy | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (INCLUDING STARVATION, SICKNESS OR ANY PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR AFFLICTION) PRIMARILY ARISING FROM PUBLIC CALAMITY (INCLUDING FAMINE, EARTHQUAKE, PESTILENCE, WAR OR CIVIL DISTURBANCE) IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF HUMANITARIAN, MEDICAL, DEVELOPMENTAL, HEALTH, EDUCATIONAL OR SOCIAL PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 CARSICK VIEW ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 3LZ
- Phone:
- 07710615348
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window