Financial history PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF GHANA NORTH LONDON DISTRICT

Charity number: 1176100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £157.53k £49.76k £73.38k £84.41k £118.85k
Total expenditure £179.78k £61.21k £77.65k £81.36k £106.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A