DERBY CITY AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association distributes recorded articles from a number of newspapers and magazines to sight impaired and physically impaired persons. A team of 'readers' record the material in digital form, this is transfered onto memory sticks and sent through the Blind Post scheme to the clients,14 publications and subjects are sent out on weekly, monthly and quarterly basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 23 April 1981: Standard registration
- 30 January 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 30 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1198808 DERBY CITY AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIAT...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.19k | £4.83k | £6.14k | £2.14k | £47.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.27k | £4.31k | £2.82k | £771 | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSITUTION ADOPTED 3 MARCH 1981
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window