DARNALL, ATTERCLIFFE AND TINSLEY IN CONTACT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities to develop links between Sheffield Christians and those in Darnall who originate from other countries particularly in the Muslim world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £150 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 April 1981: Standard registration
- THE DATIC TRUST (Working name)
- THE DATIC TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Burtenshaw Chamberlain | Chair | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Thomas Cudmore | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mahilranee Christine Townsend | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Spence | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael John Thomas | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Whitehorn | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Caroline Mary Hall | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.12k | £43.23k | £30.32k | £40.92k | £40.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.73k | £31.77k | £32.66k | £39.51k | £44.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.54k | £7.08k | N/A | £150 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JANUARY 1981 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ACTIVITIES THAT DEMONSTRATE THE CHRISTIAN VALUES OF LOVE AND SERVICE AMONG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN DARNALL, ATTERCLIFFE AND TINSLEY IN THE SAID CITY WHO ORIGINATE FROM COUNTRIES OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY BRINGING TOGETHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE OF DIFFERENT RACES AND RELIGIONS, AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND GOOD COMMUNITY RELATIONS BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT RACES AND/OR RELIGIOUS FAITHS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE BENEFICIARIES IN PRACTICAL AND OTHER LIFE SKILLS. PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR INDIVIDUAL BENEFICIARIES WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 Nidd Road
SHEFFIELD
S9 3BB
- Phone:
- 01142444832
- Email:
- admin@galeedhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window