Accounts and annual returns IBN RUSHD CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE FOR ISLAMIC RESEARCH

Charity number: 1177848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 02 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 02 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 27 October 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 27 October 2023 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 November 2020 30 September 2022 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 November 2020 30 September 2022 389 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 November 2019 30 September 2022 754 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 November 2019 30 September 2022 754 days late Download Open in new window