DERWENT VALLEY VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity Number: 1176154
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD THROUGH: THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP; THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS ARE APPROPRIATE FOR THE CHURCH, TO ENABLE IT TO FULFIL ITS MISSION TO THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £25
Total expenditure: £11,194

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2017: CIO registration
  • 25 August 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 25 August 2023: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £84.12k £129.63k £98.69k £34.12k £25
Total expenditure £66.14k £112.99k £93.26k £60.89k £11.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 March 2023 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 March 2023 140 days late
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 November 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 November 2021 29 days late
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late