Financial history SAYIT (SHEENA AMOS YOUTH TRUST)

Charity number: 1177477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £401.12k £405.06k £262.68k £345.43k £338.33k
Total expenditure £337.46k £343.59k £330.56k £343.37k £373.96k
Income from government contracts £51.00k £51.00k £51.00k £68.46k £55.85k
Income from government grants £95.48k £38.38k £68.50k N/A N/A