ASSOCIATION FOR HERITAGE INTERPRETATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AHI publishes a journal twice a year and an e-newsletter six times a year. It holds an annual conference, runs seminars and hosts a website. Membership of AHI is open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 September 2018: CIO registration
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 288493 ASSOCIATION FOR HERITAGE INTERPRETATION
- AHI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Eleanor Brown Lee | Chair | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sindi Breshani | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Stella Acan BA Hons MA | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Evans BA,MA | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Ian Glencorse | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Langham | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Walker | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Astrid Karla Krumins | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Damon Mahoney | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Ryland | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hamish Glen | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELEANOR COULTHARD | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.66k | £37.45k | £49.72k | £47.92k | £74.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.51k | £35.79k | £41.96k | £63.65k | £71.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN, AND FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE A GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF, THE NATURAL AND CULTURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE ARTS AND SCIENCES OF INTERPRETATION AND THEIR APPLICATION, THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION THEREIN AND IN PARTICULAR TO ADVANCE THE STANDARDS OF EDUCATION, QUALIFICATION, COMPETENCE AND CONDUCT OF THOSE WHO PRACTISE INTERPRETATION AS A PROFESSION. THE EXPRESSION INTERPRETATION SHALL MEAN THE PROCESS OF COMMUNICATING TO PEOPLE THE SIGNIFICANCE OF A PLACE OR OBJECT, SO THAT THEY MAY ENJOY IT MORE, UNDERSTAND THEIR HERITAGE AND ENVIRONMENT BETTER AND DEVELOP A POSITIVE ATTITUDE TO CONSERVATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Recreation Way
Kemsley
SITTINGBOURNE
ME10 2RD
- Phone:
- 01795436560
- Email:
- admin@ahi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window