Financial history ALRESFORD MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1176243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.53k £4.29k £5.51k £8.97k £18.36k
Total expenditure £4.38k £2.50k £3.22k £3.72k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £200 N/A N/A N/A