ALRESFORD MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a workshop for members to come together, socialise,and maintain their health and wellbeing. To work together on a range of projects to exercise their skills and pass them on to others. To assist the local community in practical ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 December 2017: CIO registration
- ALRESFORD MENÆS SHED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Durham | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith Brickwood | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Webb | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Scott | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER TUDOR | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.53k | £4.29k | £5.51k | £8.97k | £18.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.38k | £2.50k | £3.22k | £3.72k | £4.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £200 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE (PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MEN AGED 18 OR OVER), WITHIN ALRESFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN AND PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; AND ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Langtons Court
ALRESFORD
SO24 9UE
- Phone:
- 01962738677
- Email:
- alresfordmensshed@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window