Trustees RICKMANSWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1175867

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence William Wright | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jillian Loader | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gareth Garland | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES BASS | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CYRIL LANGLEY | Trustee | 07 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ALEXANDER WALL | Trustee | 06 January 2009 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.