Accounts and annual returns THE DAVID AND JANE RICHARDS FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1177725
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 April 2025 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 April 2025 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 April 2023 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 April 2023 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 May 2021 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 May 2021 101 days late Download Open in new window