Financial history THE DAVID AND JANE RICHARDS FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1177725
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £77.25k £525.96k £306.94k £174.34k £323
Total expenditure £130.70k £525.54k £207.12k £132.83k £40.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £72.30k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £525.94k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £16 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £525.54k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.46k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £3.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A