GOOD HEALTH AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold fundraising events and also solicit donations at physical venues or online platforms to sensitise and generate financial support to aid the aims and objectives of the GoHA project including the provision of governance for the Donald Romeo Community School , based in Kenya. We operate in the United Kingdom and utilise the internet & travel to partner with organisations in other countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Kenya
- Montserrat
- United States
Governance
- 22 February 2018: CIO registration
- GOHA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH JANE ELISABETH ROMEO | Chair | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
dr SHARON ROMEO FIVEL-DEMORET | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Meleander Gage | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.63k | £15.12k | £15.01k | £25.25k | £14.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.80k | £26.06k | £13.92k | £21.13k | £10.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S]OF GOOD HEALTH AFRICA [ARE]: 1. GOVERN AND RAISE FINANCE TO SUPPORT THE VISION / PURPOSE TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY MAINLY IN AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF - EDUCATION VIA THE DONALD ROMEO COMMUNITY SCHOOL, - HEALTH FACILITIES(CLINIC, ETC.), - CLEAN WATER FOR DRINKING AND HOUSEHOLD PURPOSES, AND - DEVELOPING THE COMMUNITY FOR SUSTAINABILITY VIA AGRICULTURE, PRISON MINISTRY, ETC. 2. THE PEOPLE WHO CAN BENEFIT ARE CHILDREN AGES 4 - 13 YEARS, WITH PREFERENCE GIVEN TO AIDS ORPHANS, WHO WERE BORN AND RESIDE IN AFRICA PARTNERING WITH TWINNING SCHOOL(S) LOCATED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, THE CARIBBEAN OR THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 3. KENYA IS CURRENTLY THE CENTRAL LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF FOCUS WHICH MAY BE EXPANDED AT A LATER DATE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF GOOD HEALTH AFRICA FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 GOUGH STREET
LONDON
WC1X 0DE
- Phone:
- 02078378315
- Email:
- info@goodhealthafrica.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window