REDBRIDGE CENTENNIAL LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1175726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund 400 eye operations in India. Recycle Eye Glasses for reuse in the world. Fed 50 homeless hungry people every month. Hot food cooked, and served. Environmentally; RCLC have funded the planting of 15 trees every year at Yorkshire Dales Millennium Trust site to create a new Woodland. Fund 50 x 11 year old girls in Redbridge Schools with their Hockey kits. Free Support Senior Citizens party

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £21,221
Total expenditure: £13,519

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • North Yorkshire
  • Redbridge
  • India
  • Kenya

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bindesh Shashtri Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Surinder Singh Kalsi Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Dr RANJAN MOHAN ADUR Trustee 20 December 2016
None on record
ANANT KUMAR PATEL Trustee 20 December 2016
None on record
HARVINDER SINGH VIRDEE Trustee 20 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.22k £8.12k £11.22k £9.66k £21.22k
Total expenditure £21.01k £10.44k £1.45k £17.16k £13.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 14 May 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 14 May 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 June 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 June 2023 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 BRAMLEY CRESCENT
ILFORD
IG2 6DA
Phone:
07985409373
Email:
No information available