Accounts and annual returns MODEL WESTMINSTER

Charity number: 1184456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 September 2022 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 16 September 2022 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window