FRIENDS OF HONLEY JUNIOR, INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF HONLEY (CE) VC JUNIOR, INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS CONNECTED WITH HONLEY (CE) VC JUNIOR, INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL ("THE SCHOOL")
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 27 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Anne Dunn | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Marjorie Skidmore | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.33k | £15.49k | £3.94k | £12.76k | £12.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.45k | £5.05k | £11.61k | £17.22k | £17.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £700 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 09 February 2021 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | 09 February 2021 | 224 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF HONLEY (CE) VC JUNIOR, INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS CONNECTED WITH HONLEY (CE) VC JUNIOR, INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL (“THE SCHOOL”)
Contact information
- Address:
-
HONLEY C OF E JUNIOR SCHOOL
JAGGAR LANE
HONLEY
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 6BT
- Phone:
- 01484508001
- Email:
- fohjins@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window