Ffrindiau Ysgol Hamadryad Friends

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PTA raising funds for local school (Ysgol Hamadryad) to enable purchases of items that support children's learning and school experiences. Typically fairs and quiz nights plus raffles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 08 November 2017: Standard registration
- CYMDEITHAS RHIENI AC ATHRAWON YSGOL HAMADRYAD PTA (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Gilbert | Chair | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mari Elena Williams | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elin Haf Rowlands | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Karen Tierney | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA HUCKSON | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/10/2019 | 05/09/2020 | 05/09/2021 | 05/09/2022 | 05/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.80k | £5.89k | £7.46k | £5.77k | £13.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.77k | £10.06k | £11.13k | £414 | £5.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 October 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 OCT 2017 as amended on 27 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Hamadryad
Hamadryad Road
CARDIFF
CF10 5UY
- Phone:
- 029 20471173
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window