Accounts and annual returns Redeemed Pillar of Fire Praying Mission Worldwide

Charity Number: 1175794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 December 2023 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 December 2023 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 November 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 November 2022 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 December 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 December 2021 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window