NORTH LEIGH WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of North Leigh and the repair and maintenance of the Memorial cross in North Leigh Churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 16 November 2017: CIO registration
- 15 June 2018: Funds received from 250459 NORTH LEIGH WAR MEMORIAL HALL
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BURGUM | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sara Dickinson | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Burt | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Taylor | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE LYNN DUFFELL ACMA,CGMA | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ANN LAURA GODDARD | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.58k | £33.84k | £54.48k | £30.35k | £33.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.60k | £26.70k | £33.16k | £35.79k | £52.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.68k | £11.95k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH LEIGH HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE OF MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MEMORIAL CROSS IN NORTH LEIGH CHURCHYARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Leigh War Memorial Hall
Park Road
North Leigh
Witney
- Phone:
- 01993881245
- Email:
- annetteduffell@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window