Financial history BENTHAM AND DISTRICT DEMENTIA FRIENDLY COMMUNITY

Charity Number: 1176516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £1.67k £393 £1.31k
Total expenditure £333 £532 £1.65k £2.08k £289
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £123 N/A