DR SMITH'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages fund and gives an annual donation to the school and the residents of the Alms houses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Cumbria
Governance
- 11 May 1981: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 October 2017: Re-registered
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124 | £129 | £119 | £124 | £124 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £120 | £110 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 19 September 2019 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 24 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 October 2017 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7 MAY 1986
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION AND ASSITANCE IN THE MAINTENANCE OF A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACT 1944-1981. (B) SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENT OF EXPENSES IN CONNECTION WITH (A) TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN CONTINUING TO MAKE A YEARLY PAYMENT OF $17 TO THE TRUSTEES OF DR. SMITH'S ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY, IN THE PARISH OF ASBY, AND SUBJECT THERETO IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS - (1) IN PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING AT THE SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOR NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL; (2) IN PROMOTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF CHILDREN ATTENDIN THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASBY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window