Accounts and annual returns ABUNDANCE 4 LIVING

Charity number: 1177021
Charity reporting is overdue by 1169 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 438 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 438 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1169 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1169 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 30 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window