YOUTHINC SOUTH CAMBRIDGESHIRE

Charity number: 1176403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian faith amongst young people in Cambridgeshire by raising awareness and understanding of Christian beliefs and practices contributing to the spiritual and moral education of young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,092
Total expenditure: £11,031

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 December 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Revd Dr Simon Taylor KC Chair 21 March 2018
THE CAMBRIDGE THEOLOGICAL FEDERATION
Received: On time
Beverley Mercer Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Simon Neville Lake Trustee 02 November 2017
FRIENDS OF BARRINGTON SCHOOL
Received: On time
JENNIFER DUKE Trustee 02 November 2017
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY MAGDALENE CHURCH, ICKLETON, CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.57k £17.01k £11.96k £12.19k £6.09k
Total expenditure £9.95k £7.66k £11.29k £6.70k £11.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 West Green
Barrington
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 7RZ
Phone:
01223872440
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available