Financial history JAY'S AIM - HELPING YOUNG HEARTS

Charity Number: 1176807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.61k £69.39k £107.53k £130.26k £102.89k
Total expenditure £40.05k £72.60k £96.34k £141.36k £83.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.90k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.90k N/A