THE LITTLE PRINCESS TRUST

Charity number: 1176160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Little Princess Trust provides real hair wigs free of charge to children and young people up to the age of 24, who have lost their own hair due to cancer treatment and other conditions. We fund vital, innovative research leading to better treatments for childhood cancers that affect patient outcomes. We support the development of less aggressive and less toxic cancer treatments for children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Bulgaria
  • Germany
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Portugal
  • Scotland
  • Slovenia
  • Sweden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2017: CIO registration
  • 14 April 2020: Funds received from 1113172 THE LITTLE PRINCESS TRUST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIMOTHY CHARLES WHEELER Chair 01 August 2018
IAPS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Emma Corbett Trustee 25 March 2023
None on record
Alison Goodwin Trustee 21 January 2023
None on record
Caroline Shallow Trustee 21 January 2023
None on record
Richard Wells Trustee 22 October 2022
None on record
Dr Francis Mussai Trustee 22 October 2022
AZAYLIA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Mark Vickress Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
SIMON MARK TARPLEE Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Timothy Lowe Trustee 01 August 2018
HULME HALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.76m £9.09m £8.15m £6.46m £9.10m
Total expenditure £4.01m £7.81m £8.35m £9.05m £9.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.54m £8.90m £7.92m £6.08m £8.47m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £17.64k £16.32k £14.37k £47.72k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £210.96k £172.42k £195.11k £334.85k £572.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £13.75k £36.96k £8.82k
Income - Legacies £0 £10.00k £0 £2.23k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.53m £7.22m £7.71m £8.37m £8.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £472.35k £591.84k £636.83k £676.69k £897.35k
Expenditure - Governance £49.28k £84.65k £88.44k £75.72k £267.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.50m £5.88m £5.91m £6.27m £5.91m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £68.76k £68.76k £71.74k £49.87k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £970.62k £1.90m £1.98m £2.05m £1.97m
Long-term investments £9.55m £11.99m £11.44m £11.44m £12.88m
Other assets £7.60m £11.00m £11.61m £8.63m £7.73m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.95m £5.75m £6.75m £6.58m £6.35m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 12 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 12 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 20 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 20 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 08 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 15 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Hannah Tarplee Building
22-25 Berrington Street
Hereford
Herefordshire
HR4 0BJ
Phone:
01432 352359